Global Patent Index - EP 0627472 B1

EP 0627472 B1 2000-03-08 - Curable composition

Title (en)

Curable composition

Title (de)

Härtbare Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition durcissable

Publication

EP 0627472 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94108495 A

Priority

JP 13341293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0627472A2] A room temperature curable composition suitable as top coat and providing coating films having good properties such as surface appearance, gloss, stain resistance, weatherability and adhesion and a small contact angle with water, which comprises (A) an acrylic copolymer having a specific reactive silicon-containing group such as alkoxysilyl group, (B) a specific hydrolyzable silicon compound and/or its partial hydrolysis condensation product, (C) a specific curing catalyst such as an organic carboxylic acid, a combination of an organic carboxylic acid with an organic amine, or an organometallic compound, and (D) an adhesion improving agent such as a silane coupling agent or its reaction product with an epoxy compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 133/04; C08K 5/00; C08L 33/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/5415 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/5415 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08K 5/5415 + C08L 43/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0627472 A2 19941207; EP 0627472 A3 19970730; EP 0627472 B1 20000308; DE 69423258 D1 20000413; DE 69423258 T2 20000713; US 5399601 A 19950321

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070602

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070602

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070602

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOUR AND CY

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-08-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060817

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060608

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-06-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423258 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

1998-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980528

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980103

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

1994-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT