Global patent index - EP 0627510 B1

EP 0627510 B1 2000-09-20 - Opening roller for an open-end-spinning machine and method for producing it

Title (en)

Opening roller for an open-end-spinning machine and method for producing it

Title (de)

Auflösewalze für eine O-E-Spinnvorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Cylindre peigneur pour une machine à filer à bout libre et méthode pour fabriquer celui-ci

Publication

EP 0627510 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94108472 A

Priority

  • CZ 106093 A
  • CZ 106193 A
  • CZ 106293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0627510A1] The opening roller (1) of a fibre-separating device of an open-end spinning machine contains a cylindrical body (2) equipped on its outer circumference with teeth (3) which are formed as a result of the penetration of at least one helical groove (5) with a number of recesses (6). The recesses (6) extend on the circumference of the cylindrical body (2) at an angle to the generatrix (71) parallel to the axis (7) of the cylindrical body (2). The depth of the recesses is preferably greater than the depth of the helical groove. The helical groove preferably has a differently shaped bottom. The opening roller (1) is produced by simultaneously imparting rotational movement to the cylindrical body (2) while the recesses (6) are being made. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/00; D01H 4/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0627510 A1 19941207; EP 0627510 B1 20000920; EP 0627510 B2 20041124; DE 59409525 D1 20001026

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2006-08-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-01-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-12-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2004-11-24 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-08-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040802

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-06-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-02-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-12-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-26

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960830

1996-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960830

1995-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950517

1994-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI