Global Patent Index - EP 0627524 B1

EP 0627524 B1 2000-10-25 - Web former in a paper machine

Title (en)

Web former in a paper machine

Title (de)

Blattbildungspartie in einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Section de formage dans une machine à papier

Publication

EP 0627524 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94850086 A

Priority

FI 932265 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0627524A1] The invention concerns a twin-wire (10,20) web former in a paper machine, comprising a single-wire initial portion, after which the twin-wire zone starts in the area of the ribbed deck (22a) of the first forming shoe (22) placed inside one of the wire loops (10). After the first forming shoe (22), a pressure-loaded (pk) dewatering unit (100) is fitted, which is provided with opposite sets of ribs (31,41) and with dewatering chambers (12,13). The first dewatering chamber (12) in this dewatering unit (100) is placed above the first forming shoe (22) so as, through its suction-deflector duct (16), to remove substantially water that drains from the area of the curved ribbed deck (22a) of the first forming shoe (22). The first dewatering chamber (12) is followed by a second dewatering chamber (13), whose lower part is connected with a set of dewatering and guide ribs (41), into whose gap spaces (41R) the drain duct (19) of the second dewatering chamber (13) is opened. Against the set of dewatering and guide ribs (41), a set of loading ribs operates, which is placed inside the opposite wire loop (20) and which operates by means of the medium pressure (pk) of the loading hoses (33). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00; D21F 1/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/48 (2006.01); D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/003 (2013.01); D21F 1/48 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4769111 A 19880906 - NEVALAINEN TAISTO A [FI], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0627524 A1 19941207; EP 0627524 B1 20001025; AT 197177 T 20001115; CA 2123821 A1 19941119; CA 2123821 C 20000516; DE 69426169 D1 20001130; DE 69426169 T2 20010517; FI 932265 A0 19930518; FI 932265 A 19941119; FI 99033 B 19970613; FI 99033 C 19970925

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050517

2006-01-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050517

2005-05-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050517

2005-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050517

2004-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040512

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040510

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040505

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040504

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426169 20001130

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-25 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-25 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197177 T 20001115

1997-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALMET CORPORATION

1996-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960621

1995-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950509

1994-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE