Global Patent Index - EP 0627716 B1

EP 0627716 B1 2000-03-01 - Apparatus for central acquisition of energy consumption costs

Title (en)

Apparatus for central acquisition of energy consumption costs

Title (de)

Anlage zur zentralen Erfassung von Energieverbrauchskosten

Title (fr)

Installation pour l'acquisition centrale des frais de consommation d'energie

Publication

EP 0627716 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94106017 A

Priority

DE 4312596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0627716A1] The invention relates to UHF radio transmission of measured values between consumption distributor devices (10) and a receiver circuit (1 - 6), assigned thereto, of a control centre (1 - 3, 5 - 9). So-called SAW components, that is to say surface acoustic wave resonators, are preferred as frequency-determining elements for the UHF transmitter circuits. With a view to possible, in particular temperature-induced frequency deviations of the UHF transmitters (10), the input of the receiver circuit (6) is maintained with a correspondingly broad bandwidth (Df). For interference suppression of external frequencies in this range (Df), there is now assigned to the receiver circuit (6) a scanner (3) which continuously scans the input band in a narrow-band (df) fashion in order to acquire signals which arrive from the consumption distributor devices (10) and which are as free as possible from external and interference signals. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4312596 A1 19941020; EP 0627716 A1 19941207; EP 0627716 B1 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-01-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-04-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI NL

1997-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971013

1995-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950607

1994-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI NL