Global Patent Index - EP 0627906 B1

EP 0627906 B1 2000-05-24 - IMPROVEMENTS IN BLISTER PACKS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN BLISTER PACKS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE BLISTERPACKUNGEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATION CONCERNANT LES PLAQUETTES BLISTER

Publication

EP 0627906 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93903726 A

Priority

  • AU 9300063 W
  • AU PL108792 A
  • AU PL349492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9316673A1] A blister pack for tablets or capsules having a flexible plastic sheet (1) thermoformed to define a plurality of open faced pockets (2) each pocket being shaped to receive an individual tablet or capsule, the open faces of the pockets being closed by a sheet of aluminium foil heat sealed to the plastic sheet, characterised in that hinge means (5) are provided across the pack on a line about which the pack is substantially symmetrical, the two halves ot the pack on either side of the hinge being adapted to be folded together with the area of aluminium foil of each said halves overlying the other whereby the aluminium foil is protected from accidental damage that might be caused by contact with a hard object, resealable fastening means (6, 7) being provided to maintain the pack in a folded configuration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/03 (2006.01); B65D 75/32 (2006.01); B65D 75/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/035 (2013.01); B65D 75/323 (2013.01); B65D 75/327 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9316673 A1 19930902; AU 3486693 A 19930913; AU 671979 B2 19960919; DE 69328718 D1 20000629; DE 69328718 T2 20010111; EP 0627906 A1 19941214; EP 0627906 A4 19980422; EP 0627906 B1 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110212

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110212

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100202

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2006-02-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060209

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-15 [REG GB 711G] CORRECTION ALLOWED (SECT. 117/1977)

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-02 [REG GB 711L] APPL. MADE FOR CORRECTION OF ERROR (SECT. 117/77) NOW OPEN TO OPPOSITION

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328718 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980812

1998-04-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980303

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1994-12-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940817

1994-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT