Global Patent Index - EP 0628386 B1

EP 0628386 B1 2000-02-09 - Vegetable slicer

Title (en)

Vegetable slicer

Title (de)

Gemüsehobel

Title (fr)

Râpe à légumes

Publication

EP 0628386 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94810323 A

Priority

CH 169593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0628386A1] Vegetable cutter having a replaceable inclined sliding surface (4) which is arranged in front of the cutting knife and extends beneath the cutting edge of the knife for a distance equal to the width of the cutting gap. The casing is composed of two parts, having a lower part (16) which acts both as a support and as a container for the material to be cut. The two casing parts are connected to one another by means of a separable articulation (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47J 43/28 (2006.01); B26B 5/00 (2006.01); B26D 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/283 (2013.01); B26D 2003/285 (2013.01); B26D 2003/286 (2013.01); B26D 2003/288 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0628386 A1 19941214; EP 0628386 B1 20000209; AT 189643 T 20000215; AU 6335094 A 19941208; AU 677831 B2 19970508; CA 2124261 A1 19941208; DE 59409133 D1 20000316; JP H07148693 A 19950613; TW 330469 U 19980421

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2008-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MOHA MODERNE HAUSHALTWAREN AG

- Free text: MOHA MODERNE HAUSHALTWAREN AG#TANNHOLZSTRASSE 14, POSTFACH#CH-3052 ZOLLIKOFEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- MOHA MODERNE HAUSHALTWAREN AG#TANNHOLZSTRASSE 14, POSTFACH#CH-3052 ZOLLIKOFEN (CH)

2006-09-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MODERNE HAUSHALTWAREN A.G. MOHA

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-08-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-01 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409133 20000316

2000-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-02-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189643 T 20000215

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980204

1995-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950608

1994-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL