Global patent index - EP 0628660 B1

EP 0628660 B1 2000-09-20 - Rail bar

Title (en)

Rail bar

Title (de)

Eisenbahnschiene

Title (fr)

Rail de chemin de fer

Publication

EP 0628660 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94201449 A

Priority

NL 9300891 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0628660A1] Noise nuisance is considerably reduced by arranging in the web recess of a rail bar a mouldable material (9) with a low specific mass, for instance Corkelast TM . When a body of considerably greater specific mass (10,11) is arranged in this mass the generated noise is limited still further. Application in a railway system wherein the body of the wheels of the train or tram is filled with Corkelast TM brings about a still further limitation of the noise nuisance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 19/003 (2013.01); E01B 2204/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0628660 A1 19941214; EP 0628660 B1 20000920; DE 69425927 D1 20001026; DE 69425927 T2 20010329; ES 2152287 T3 20010201; HU 216418 B 19990628; HU 9402859 D0 19950130; HU T74133 A 19961128; NL 9300891 A 19941216

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140525

2014-09-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140926

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140527

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140523

2014-06-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140523

2014-06-04 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20140524

2014-05-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69425927

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-08-01 [NLUE] NL: LICENCE REGISTERED WITH REGARD TO EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLUE

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-07-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152287

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69425927

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-26

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

1997-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961227

1995-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950613

1994-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL