Global patent index - EP 0629234 B2

EP 0629234 B2 2000-01-26 - LUBRICANTS FOR CHAIN BELT CONVEYORS AND THEIR USE

Title (en)

LUBRICANTS FOR CHAIN BELT CONVEYORS AND THEIR USE

Title (de)

KETTENTRANSPORTBAND-SCHMIERMITTEL UND IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

LUBRIFIANTS POUR BANDES TRANSPORTEUSES COMMANDEES PAR CHAINE ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0629234 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 93904003 A

Priority

  • DE 4206505 A
  • EP 9300412 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9318120A1] Clear water-soluble lubricants for chain belt conveyors contain a combination of: (a) at least one or several compounds having the general formula (1), in which R<1> stands for a saturated, mono- or polyunsaturated, linear or branched-chain alkyl residue with 6 to 22 C atoms, that may if required be substituted by -OH, -NH2, -NH-, -CO-, halogen or a carboxyl residue; R<2> stands for a carboxyl residue with 2 to 7 C atoms; M stands for hydrogen, an alkali metal, ammonium, an alkyl residue with 1 to 4 C atoms or a benzyl residue; and n stands for an integer in the range from 1 to 6; (b) at least one organic carboxylic acid selected among monobasic or multibasic, saturated, monounsaturated or polyunsaturated carboxylic acids having 2 to 22 C atoms; (c) water and additives and/or adjuvants, if required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 20/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/16 (2006.01); C10N 30/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2207/12 (2013.01); C10M 2207/121 (2013.01); C10M 2207/122 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 173/02 + C10M 129/28 + C10M 133/06

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9318120 A1 19930916; AT 130360 T 19951215; AU 3498493 A 19931005; AU 662604 B2 19950907; BR 9306004 A 19971021; CA 2131388 A1 19930916; CA 2131388 C 20020723; CZ 9402096 A3 19941215; DE 59300966 D1 19951221; DK 0629234 T3 19960325; DK 0629234 T4 20001204; EP 0629234 A1 19941221; EP 0629234 B1 19951115; EP 0629234 B2 20000126; ES 2079965 T3 19960116; ES 2079965 T5 20000401; FI 943995 A0 19940831; FI 943995 A 19940831; JP H07504451 A 19950518; NO 942135 A 19940608; NO 942135 D0 19940608; RU 94041745 A 19960810; SK 103694 A3 19950208; US 6372698 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130223

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-03-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20130221

2013-03-06 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20130222

2013-02-25 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

2013-02-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59300966

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120203

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080222

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070223

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070223

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL-ECOLAB G.M.B.H & CO. OHG

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070222

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-03-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060109

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-04 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2000-06-05 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-06-02 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-05-31 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-04-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-04-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-02-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-01-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-11-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Document Number: 93904003.6

- Format of ref. document F/P: F

1997-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

1997-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

1997-08-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

1997-07-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 19960815

1997-07-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

1997-06-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HENKEL-ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

1997-05-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: REAKTIVIERUNG NACH IRRTUEMLICHER LOESCHUNG

1997-02-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19970223

1996-12-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

1996-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

1996-10-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 19960815

1996-03-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

1996-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960217

1996-02-15 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 19960215

- Year of fee payment: 04

1996-02-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

1996-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2079965

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1995-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59300966

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 19951221

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1995-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1995-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 130360

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 19951215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1995-02-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950110

1994-12-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940824

1994-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE