Global Patent Index - EP 0629714 B1

EP 0629714 B1 2000-04-12 - Martensitic stainless steel with improved machinability

Title (en)

Martensitic stainless steel with improved machinability

Title (de)

Martensitisches rostfreies Stahl mit verbesserter Bearbeitbarkeit

Title (fr)

Acier inoxydable martensitique à usinabilité améliorée

Publication

EP 0629714 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94401246 A

Priority

FR 9307141 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0629714A1] Martensitic stainless steel with improved machinability, characterised in that its composition by weight is the following: - carbon lower than 1.2 % - silicon lower than or equal to 2 % - manganese lower than or equal to 2 % - chromium: 10.5 < Cr < 19 % - sulphur lower than or equal to 0.55 % - calcium higher than 32 x 10<-4> % - oxygen higher than 70 x 10<-4> %, - the ratio of the calcium and oxygen contents Ca/O being 0.2 < Ca/O < 0.6, the said steel being subjected to at least one quenching heat treatment in order to give it a martensitic structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C21C 7/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/18 (2006.01); C22C 38/34 (2006.01); C22C 38/38 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01); C22C 38/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/60 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP S55122858 A 19800920 - DAIDO STEEL CO LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0629714 A1 19941221; EP 0629714 B1 20000412; AT 191753 T 20000415; CA 2125732 A1 19941215; CA 2125732 C 20000801; CZ 292392 B6 20030917; CZ 9401419 A3 19950816; DE 69423930 D1 20000518; DE 69423930 T2 20000817; DK 0629714 T3 20000717; EG 20378 A 19990228; ES 2145109 T3 20000701; FI 106267 B 20001229; FI 942801 A0 19940613; FI 942801 A 19941215; FR 2706489 A1 19941223; FR 2706489 B1 19950901; GR 3033773 T3 20001031; IL 109919 A 19980222; IL 109919 D0 19941007; JP 3398772 B2 20030421; JP H07150308 A 19950613; NO 303180 B1 19980608; NO 942168 A 19941215; NO 942168 D0 19940610; PL 179128 B1 20000731; PL 303831 A1 19950109; PT 629714 E 20000929; RO 115276 B1 19991230; RU 2080410 C1 19970527; RU 94020719 A 19960627; SG 48134 A1 19980417; SI 0629714 T1 20000831; TR 28472 A 19960724; TW 304985 B 19970511; US 5427635 A 19950627

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140607

2014-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-09-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140926

2014-08-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140617

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140607

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140605

2014-07-30 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-06-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *UGITECH

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-06-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140605

2014-06-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-06-10 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-06-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69423930

2013-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130702

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130617

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130611

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130104

2013-03-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20000401470

- Effective date: 20130104

2013-02-28 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20130111

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191753 T

- Effective date: 20110606

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110606

2012-01-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120101

2011-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-04-30 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: UGITECH, FR

- Effective date: 20070409

2007-04-30 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: UGITECH; FR

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-03-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: UGITECH

- Free text: UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY#AVENUE PAUL GIROD#73400 UGINE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- UGITECH#AVENUE PAUL GIROD#73400 UGINE (FR)

2007-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: UGITECH

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-07-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145109 T3

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423930 20000518

2000-05-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19940609

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191753 T 20000415

1999-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY

1997-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970725

1994-12-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940909

1994-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1994-12-21 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 940609