Global Patent Index - EP 0629829 B2

EP 0629829 B2 2000-04-05 - Air distillation plant

Title (en)

Air distillation plant

Title (de)

Luftdestillationseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Installation de distillation d'air

Publication

EP 0629829 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 94401215 A

Priority

FR 9306645 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0629829A1] This plant, of modular design which is easy to transport and to assemble on the site, comprises: an air compressor unit (1); two bottles (tanks) (2A, 2B) for purification of air by adsorption; an air distillation column (5); one or two frameworks (13, 31) in which all the other elements of the plant are mounted: heat exchangers (24, 25), cold accessories (26, 27), hot accessories (14, 17, 18, 19), all the connecting pipes and all the monitoring, control and instrumentation elements (21, 28); and conduits (6) for connection between the various parts of the plant. Application to double-column air distillation plants. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01); F25J 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/0489 (2013.01); F25J 3/04872 (2013.01); F25J 3/04945 (2013.01); Y10S 62/905 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • DE 2822774 A1 19791129 - LINDE AG
  • AT 216721 B 19610810 - LUDOWICI JOHANN WILHELM DR ING [DE]
  • EP 0538857 A1 19930428 - LINDE AG [DE]
  • Güther, H., "Standard air separation plants, Type of application, High-purity gases, New developments", 5ème Symposium sur les installations de distillation d'air, Munich, 25.-27.06.86
  • Winkler, D., "Neue technische Lösungen bei kleinen Luftzerlegern", Symposium Linde sur les installations de distillation d'air, octobre 1980

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0629829 A1 19941221; EP 0629829 B1 19970502; EP 0629829 B2 20000405; CA 2124898 A1 19941204; CN 1049842 C 20000301; CN 1118277 A 19960313; CN 1261653 A 20000802; DE 69402914 D1 19970605; DE 69402914 T2 19971218; DE 69402914 T3 20001109; ES 2104301 T3 19971001; ES 2104301 T5 20000701; FR 2706025 A1 19941209; FR 2706025 B1 19950728; JP H06347164 A 19941220; US 5461871 A 19951031

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. L'*AIR LIQUIDE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020603

2001-06-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010511

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-07-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-06-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000608

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-04-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT

1998-03-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, WIESBADEN

- Effective date: 19980130

1997-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2104301 T3

1997-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69402914 19970605

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT

1996-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960307

1994-12-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940615

1994-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT