Global patent index - EP 0629955 B1

EP 0629955 B1 2000-02-23 - Arbitration logic for multiple bus computer system

Title (en)

Arbitration logic for multiple bus computer system

Title (de)

Arbitrierungslogik für Mehrfachbus-Rechnersystem

Title (fr)

Logique d'arbitrage pour système d'ordinateur à bus multiples

Publication

EP 0629955 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94303782 A

Priority

US 6925393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0629955A1] An arbitration mechanism 42 is provided for use in a computer system 10 which comprises (i) a central processing unit (CPU) 24; (ii) a first system bus 36 which connects the CPU 24 to system memory 32 so that the CPU 24 can read data from, and write data to, the system memory 32; (iii) a second system bus 16 connected to the CPU 24; (iv) a host bridge 20 connecting the second-system bus 16 to a peripheral bus 22, the peripheral bus 22 having at least one peripheral device 18 attached thereto; and (v) an input/output (I/O) bridge 78 connecting the peripheral bus 22 to a standard I/O bus 92, the standard I/O bus 92 having a plurality of standard I/O devices 90 attached thereto. The arbitration mechanism 42 comprises (i) a first level 100 of logic for arbitrating between the plurality of standard I/O devices 90, wherein one standard I/O device 90 is selected from a plurality of the standard I/O devices 90 competing for access to the standard I/O bus 97, and (ii) a second level 102, 104 of logic for arbitrating between the selected standard I/O device 90, the CPU 24 and the at least one peripheral device 18, wherein one of the selected standard I/O device 90, the CPU 24 and the at least one peripheral device 18 is selected to access the peripheral bus 22. The arbitration mechanism 42 includes sideband signals which connect the first 100 and second levels 102, 104 of arbitration logic and include arbitration identification information corresponding to the selected standard I/O device 90. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 13/364; G06F 13/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/36 (2006.01); G06F 13/362 (2006.01); G06F 13/364 (2006.01); G06F 13/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/364 (2013.01); G06F 13/4031 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0629955 A1 19941221; EP 0629955 B1 20000223; CA 2118995 A1 19941129; CA 2118995 C 19970408; DE 69423056 D1 20000330; DE 69423056 T2 20000914; JP 2552085 B2 19961106; JP H06337841 A 19941206; KR 960016410 B1 19961211; US 5396602 A 19950307

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140527

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140524

2014-06-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140524

2014-05-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69423056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130606

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130510

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-05-13 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20090417

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69423056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-30

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980803

1995-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950323

1994-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB