Global Patent Index - EP 0631011 B1

EP 0631011 B1 2000-03-29 - Headbox for a papermaking machine

Title (en)

Headbox for a papermaking machine

Title (de)

Stoffauflauf einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Caisse de tête pour une machine à papier

Publication

EP 0631011 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94108549 A

Priority

DE 4318430 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0631011A1] The invention relates to a headbox system of a paper machine having the following features: 1.1 a central distributor is provided for the uniform distribution of the stock suspension, having an integrated attenuation system; 1.2 a forming unit constructed modularly in rows is provided; 1.2.1 at least one module per row being provided as a line connecting module; 1.2.2 a nozzle module being provided in each case; 1.2.3 at least one intermediate module - for example a formation module, a turbulence module, a diffusor module, a rectifier module, a perforated roll module or any desired combinations of these - being provided; 1.2.4 the intermediate modules being provided symmetrically with respect to at least one plane in the machine direction; 1.2.5 the flange elements of the modules being provided to be compatible with each other; 1.3 a multiplicity of optionally flexible connecting lines between distributor and forming unit are provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/00; D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/026 (2013.01); D21F 1/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4318430 A1 19941208; DE 4318430 C2 19970327; EP 0631011 A1 19941228; EP 0631011 B1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070603

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-06-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE

2000-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

1997-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970228

1995-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950727

1994-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE