Global Patent Index - EP 0631022 B1

EP 0631022 B1 2000-04-19 - Tridimensional element for building purposes and its manufacturing process

Title (en)

Tridimensional element for building purposes and its manufacturing process

Title (de)

Raumkörper zur Errichtung von Bauwerken und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Elément tridimensionnel pour la construction d'ouvrages et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0631022 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94106923 A

Priority

DE 4314714 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0631022A2] The invention discloses a free-standing carcass unit or system-built structural unit, as three-dimensional body for constructing single-storey or multiple-storey building structures from a multiplicity of such three-dimensional bodies, each three-dimensional body being made up to prefabricated compound elements which each form a two-hinged frame in the longitudinal direction and a three-hinged frame in the transverse direction. The three-hinged frame can be transferred into a two-hinged frame by positive or frictional locking. Advantageously, the two prefabricated compound elements are produced together from concrete in such a manner that, after their manufacture, they can be separated for transportation and/or for storage, can be connected once again on site for constructing the building structure, and can be separated once again for dismantling the building structure in order then, if appropriate, to be used in a corresponding manner for constructing another building structure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/348; B28B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 23/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/348 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 23/00 (2013.01); E04B 1/34823 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4314714 A1 19941117; AT 191944 T 20000515; EP 0631022 A2 19941228; EP 0631022 A3 19950719; EP 0631022 B1 20000419; ES 2147563 T3 20000916

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-06-02 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010602

2001-06-02 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010602

2001-05-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-05-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147563 T3

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MANFRED SAEGER PATENTANWALT

2000-07-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-07-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000629

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000623

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000612

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409294 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191944 T 20000515

1996-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960312

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960110

1995-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1994-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL