Global Patent Index - EP 0631057 B2

EP 0631057 B2 2000-11-29 - Piston with a sealing

Title (en)

Piston with a sealing

Title (de)

Kolben mit Dichtung

Title (fr)

Piston avec joint d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 0631057 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94103900 A

Priority

DE 4320840 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0631057A1] Seal for a piston operated by a fluidic medium, containing a supporting body (1) of non-magnetisable material, which at least partly encloses an annular permanent magnet (2) and is connected to at least one sealing lip (3) of elastomeric material, in which arrangement the sealing lip (3) projects on the outside beyond the supporting body (1) in the radial direction and can be brought into sealing engagement with the inner wall (4) of a housing (6) surrounding the piston (5). The supporting body (1) is of one-piece design and is connected to the permanent magnet (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/28; F16J 1/00; F16J 15/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/2807 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4320840 C1 19941215; AT 157144 T 19970915; EP 0631057 A1 19941228; EP 0631057 B1 19970820; EP 0631057 B2 20001129; ES 2107069 T3 19971116; ES 2107069 T5 20010216

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040315

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040314

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-03-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040314

2004-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040314

2003-03-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030310

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030306

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020312

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-02-02 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-12-27 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2000-12-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-11-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-29 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- Free Format Text: 7F 15B 15/28 A, 7F 16J 15/32 B, 7F 16J 1/00 B

2000-11-29 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: PISTON WITH A SEALING

1998-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FESTO AG & CO

- Effective date: 19980314

1997-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2107069

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1997-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

1997-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1997-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59403770

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1997-09-25

1997-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19970828

1997-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1997-08-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970820

1997-08-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 157144

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1997-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1996-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960730

1994-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940728

1994-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE