Global Patent Index - EP 0631097 B1

EP 0631097 B1 2000-04-26 - Cooling unit for coffins with detachable refrigerating plate and liquid recovery

Title (en)

Cooling unit for coffins with detachable refrigerating plate and liquid recovery

Title (de)

Kühlgerät für Särge mit abnehmbarem Verdampfer und Rückgewinnung von Kältemittel

Title (fr)

Appareil de refroidissement pour cerceuils avec évaporateur détachable et récuperation de réfrigérant

Publication

EP 0631097 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94108336 A

Priority

IT MI931333 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0631097A1] Cooling unit for coffins comprising a refrigerating circuit in which a first heat exchange fluid circulates therein and a second circuit in which a second heat exchange fluid circulates, connected with a refrigerating plate in a condition of heat exchange with the coffin. The plate is of disposable kind i.e. detachable from the remaining of the cooling unit and left into the coffin after the final closure thereof. Means are also provided to allow the draining of the heat exchange fluid from the refrigerating plate and the recovery of said fluid in a suitable tank to allow the reuse of the remaining part of the cooling unit by insertion of other plates. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 15/00; A61G 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 17/00 (2006.01); F25D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 17/002 (2013.01); F25D 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0631097 A1 19941228; EP 0631097 B1 20000426; AT 192231 T 20000515; DE 69424090 D1 20000531; DE 69424090 T2 20000914; ES 2148256 T3 20001016; IT 1264864 B1 19961017; IT MI931333 A1 19941223; IT MI931333 D0 19930622

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2006-07-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148256 T3

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424090 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL

2000-04-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192231 T 20000515

1997-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970515

1995-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950603

1994-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL