Global Patent Index - EP 0631293 B1

EP 0631293 B1 2001-05-16 - Planar inductor with operative calibrating in a RF system

Title (en)

Planar inductor with operative calibrating in a RF system

Title (de)

Planar-Induktivität mit operativer Kalibrierung in einem RF-System

Title (fr)

Inductivité plane avec calibrage opérative dans un système RF

Publication

EP 0631293 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94830295 A

Priority

IT RM930414 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0631293A1] A thick-film planar inductor is made according to a specific geometry with conventional techniques. Such device is then operatively calibrated for tuning the circuit to which it is connected by changing the geometry of the inductor through laser etching. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 17/00; H01F 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/045 (2013.01); H01F 17/0006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0631293 A1 19941228; EP 0631293 B1 20010516; DE 69427208 D1 20010621; DE 69427208 T2 20020418; ES 2094704 T1 19970201; ES 2094704 T3 20010916; IT 1262369 B 19960619; IT RM930414 A1 19941225; IT RM930414 D0 19930624

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110616

2012-07-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120717

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110615

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69427208

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110615

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100701

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100708

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2094704 T3

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427208 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-02-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PLANAR INDUCTOR WITH OPERATIVE CALIBRATING IN A RF SYSTEM

1997-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970707

1997-02-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2094704 T1

1995-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950911

1994-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB