Global patent index - EP 0631850 B1

EP 0631850 B1 2000-04-26 - Device for processing workpieces

Title (en)

Device for processing workpieces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'usinage

Publication

EP 0631850 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94102999 A

Priority

DE 4321235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0631850A1] The invention relates to a device (10) for working, for example cutting or pressing, in particular for deformable sleeves, preferably of line junctions or connections, in particular to pressing pliers (10), which have at least two working members, or cutting or pressing jaws (12), and are equipped with a power-transmitting device to provide a driving force for the working members which is transmitted via at least one actuating device (32, 18) for the working members (12) to the latter, the power-transmitting device, according to the invention, generating a tensile force which can be used to close the working members (12), at least one of the actuating devices (32, 18) transmitting a tensile force in progressive fashion to at least one of the working members (12), and the power arm of the actuating device (32, 18) increasing with respect to the work arm of the working members (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 7/12 (2006.01); B25B 27/14 (2006.01); B26B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 17/02 (2013.01); B25B 7/126 (2013.01); B25B 27/146 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 2867808 A 19590113 - SITTERT PAUL R VAN

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0631850 A1 19950104; EP 0631850 B1 20000426; AT 192060 T 20000515; DE 4321235 A1 19950105; DE 4321235 C2 19960530; GR 3033980 T3 20001130

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2002-12-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-09-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020909

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRANKISCHE ROHRWERKE GEBR. KIRCHNER G.M.B.H. & CO

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010205

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010205

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010202

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409301

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-31

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GR IT LI NL

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192060

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1996-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960125

1995-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950104

1995-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GR IT LI NL