Global patent index - EP 0631863 B1

EP 0631863 B1 2000-06-07 - Impact resistant transparent resin laminate

Title (en)

Impact resistant transparent resin laminate

Title (de)

Transparenter, schlagzäher Harzschichtstoff

Title (fr)

Stratifié résistant aux chocs en résine transparente

Publication

EP 0631863 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94110218 A

Priority

  • JP 16356493 A
  • JP 21051493 A
  • JP 3250194 A
  • JP 4720094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0631863A1] An impact resistant transparent resin laminate having at least one methacrylate resin plate and at least one polycarbonate resin plate which are bonded with a bisphenol type epoxy resin base soft polymer, which laminate is excellent in impact resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 27/08; F41H 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 7/04 (2006.01); B32B 27/08 (2006.01); F41H 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/0407 (2013.01); B32B 7/04 (2013.01); B32B 27/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0631863 A1 19950104; EP 0631863 B1 20000607; DE 69424827 D1 20000713; DE 69424827 T2 20001130; TW 309478 B 19970701

INPADOC legal status

2002-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-18 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Free Format Text: OGURA, KOJI * TADOKORO, YOSHIO * AMEKAWA, YOSHIHIDE * NOMA, FUSAHARU

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000830

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69424827

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000623

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970821

1995-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950623

1995-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB