Global Patent Index - EP 0631869 B1

EP 0631869 B1 2000-03-15 - INK JET HEAD HAVING IMPROVED JET PORT SURFACE, AND INK JET APPARATUS EQUIPPED WITH THE INK JET HEAD

Title (en)

INK JET HEAD HAVING IMPROVED JET PORT SURFACE, AND INK JET APPARATUS EQUIPPED WITH THE INK JET HEAD

Title (de)

TINTENSTRAHLKOPF MIT VERBESSERTER TINTENSTRAHLÖFFNUNGSOBERFLÄCHE UND TINTENSTRAHLGERÄT DAMIT VERSEHEN

Title (fr)

TETE A JET D'ENCRE PRESENTANT UNE SURFACE D'ORIFICE DE JET D'ENCRE AMELIOREE, ET APPAREIL A JET D'ENCRE DOTE DE CETTE TETE

Publication

EP 0631869 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93922649 A

Priority

  • JP 28027592 A
  • JP 28027692 A
  • JP 9301495 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960733A2] An ink jet head, including (i) a plurality of discharging outlets (D; 4) disposed in an arrangement direction; (ii) a plurality of ink pathways (31), each of said ink pathways (31) communicating with an associated one of said discharging outlets (D; 4), each of said ink pathways (31) having an energy generating element for generating energy for discharging an ink from said discharging outlet (D; 4); and (iii) a discharging outlet face (1A; 8) having a discharging outlet surface, said discharging outlets (D; 4) being arranged in said discharging outlet surface and a water-repellent discharging outlet peripheral region (E; 7) circumscribing said discharging outlets (D; 4), and having a first side and a second side, herewith a recessed hydrophilic region (9) circumscribing said water-repellent discharging outlet peripheral region (E; 7), said recessed hydrophilic region (9) being positioned along the arrangement direction of the discharging outlets (D; 4) on at least one said side of said water-repellent discharging outlet peripheral region (E; 7), said recessed hydrophilic region (9) being separated by a predetermined distance from said water-repellent discharging outlet peripheral region (E; 7). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/135; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 2/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16538 (2013.01); B41J 2/14 (2013.01); B41J 2/14016 (2013.01); B41J 2/14201 (2013.01); B41J 2/1433 (2013.01); B41J 2/1606 (2013.01); B41J 2/1652 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14475 (2013.01); B41J 2002/16502 (2013.01); B41J 2202/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960733 A2 19991201; EP 0960733 A3 20000105; EP 0960733 B1 20030618; AU 5156993 A 19940509; AU 676214 B2 19970306; CA 2126232 A1 19940428; CA 2126232 C 20000516; CN 1056804 C 20000927; CN 1086767 A 19940518; DE 69328086 D1 20000420; DE 69328086 T2 20000914; DE 69333056 D1 20030724; DE 69333056 T2 20040129; EP 0631869 A1 19950104; EP 0631869 A4 19950517; EP 0631869 B1 20000315; KR 100191749 B1 19990615; WO 9408793 A1 19940428

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121018

2013-08-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69328086

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121018

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121018

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111109

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328086 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960401

1995-05-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1995-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1995-01-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940622

1995-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT