Global Patent Index - EP 0632121 B1

EP 0632121 B1 2000-03-01 - An antifoulant for petrochemical processes

Title (en)

An antifoulant for petrochemical processes

Title (de)

Ablagerungsinhibitor für petrochemische Verfahren

Title (fr)

Inhibiteur d'incrustation pour procédés pétrochimiques

Publication

EP 0632121 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94109954 A

Priority

JP 18924993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0632121A2] An antifoulant for petrochemical processes comprising a hydrogen-donating hydroaromatic compound is disclosed. It can be handled easily, is inexpensive, has no adverse effect on the process, shows excellent effect to prevent formation of fouling, and enables continuous operation of a plant for a long time with good stability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 75/04; C10G 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 7/00 (2006.01); C10G 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 9/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0632121 A2 19950104; EP 0632121 A3 19950517; EP 0632121 B1 20000301; BR 9402609 A 19950404; CN 1102848 A 19950524; CN 1110534 C 20030604; DE 69423140 D1 20000406; DE 69423140 T2 20000824; JP H0718265 A 19950120; KR 0140052 B1 19980615

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050628

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050628

2004-07-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040708

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040603

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423140 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

1998-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971128

1995-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951020

1995-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

1995-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL