Global Patent Index - EP 0632199 B1

EP 0632199 B1 2000-02-02 - Method to control an ignition coil

Title (en)

Method to control an ignition coil

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Ansteuern einer Zündspule

Title (fr)

Méthode de commande d'une bobine d'allumage

Publication

EP 0632199 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94110260 A

Priority

DE 4322014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0632199A2] In a method for the activation of an ignition coil, it is proposed, in order to transmit additional data for controlling the ignition energy between control module and ignition output stage over a time range of no significance for the ignition, that an additional control pulse (E) be transmitted between two ignition pulses (N2, N3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/045; F02P 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/045 (2006.01); F02P 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 15/12 (2013.01); F02P 3/0456 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 2810665 A1 19790920 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0632199 A2 19950104; EP 0632199 A3 19950719; EP 0632199 B1 20000202; DE 4322014 A1 19950119; DE 4322014 C2 19950622

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060702

2006-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409116 20000309

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-01-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1997-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970131

1995-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1995-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950505

1995-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE