Global Patent Index - EP 0632242 B1

EP 0632242 B1 2000-08-02 - Drying and/or heating of bulk material

Title (en)

Drying and/or heating of bulk material

Title (de)

Trocknung und/oder Erhitzung von rieselfähigem Material

Title (fr)

Séchage et/ou chauffage de matériau en vrac

Publication

EP 0632242 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94108846 A

Priority

  • CH 120494 A
  • CH 199993 A
  • DE 9318822 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0632242A1] In order to dry and/or heat bulk material in a drying drum (1a/b), in particular in asphalt plants, the temperature of the waste gases of a burner (5a/b) which heats the drying drum (1a/b) is measured. In addition to this measured value, there is determined a measured value in connection with the material to be supplied to the drying and/or heating process and/or already undergoing the latter, and the inflow of the combustible medium and oxygen carrier for the burner (5a/b) is controlled as a function of the measured values. By this procedure, the heating and/or drying process for the material to be used is controlled in such a way that the process proceeds in a manner which is optimal in terms of fuel engineering, with low pollutant content in the waste gases. The apparatus for carrying out the process has a burner (5a/b) arranged in a drying drum (1a/b) rotatable about the longitudinal axis (2), a temperature-measuring device (22a/b) and a filter arrangement (17) for the burner waste gases, an adjusting device (31a/b, 32a/b) for adjusting the inflow of combustion medium and oxygen carrier, a measuring device (22a/b; 24a/b; 25a-f; 27a-f) for measuring at least one physical value of the material to be supplied to the drying and/or heating process and/or already undergoing the latter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 11/04; F26B 23/02; F26B 25/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 11/04 (2006.01); F26B 23/02 (2006.01); F26B 25/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 11/04 (2013.01); F26B 23/02 (2013.01); F26B 25/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0632242 A1 19950104; EP 0632242 B1 20000802; AT 195176 T 20000815

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050609

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020609

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020609

2002-06-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020609

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-06-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010615

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409467 20000907

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195176 T 20000815

2000-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

1997-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970423

1995-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950609

1995-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL