Global Patent Index - EP 0632482 B1

EP 0632482 B1 2000-03-15 - Gas phase ion source for high mass resolution, wide mass range time-of-flight mass spectrometer

Title (en)

Gas phase ion source for high mass resolution, wide mass range time-of-flight mass spectrometer

Title (de)

Gasphasen-Ionenquelle für Flugzeit-Massenspektrometer mit hoher Massenauflösung und grossem Massenbereich

Title (fr)

Source d'ions en phase gazeuse pour spectromètre de masse à temps de vol, présentant une résolution en masse élevée ainsi qu'une large gamme de masses

Publication

EP 0632482 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94110274 A

Priority

DE 4322101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0632482A2] In order to achieve a high mass resolution in a time-of-flight mass spectrometer with gas phase ion source, the initial-speed components in the acceleration direction of the ions must be kept small. This can be achieved in that the gas or ion beam to be investigated traverses the ion source at right angles relative to the acceleration direction. If acceleration direction and flight direction of the gas or ion beam to be investigated are not parallel, then the flight path is loaded with less gas ballast, the dynamic range of the mass spectrometer being increased as a result. The mass range of such an ion source is limited by the fact that heavy ions can be deflected too far from the axis of the ion source and can get lost as a result. When the deflection field is already located in the acceleration path, the mass range of this ion source can be expanded significantly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 49/40; H01J 49/06; H01J 49/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/62 (2006.01); H01J 27/02 (2006.01); H01J 49/10 (2006.01); H01J 49/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/403 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0632482 A2 19950104; EP 0632482 A3 19951129; EP 0632482 B1 20000315; AT 190751 T 20000415; CA 2127185 A1 19950103; DE 4322101 A1 19950119; DE 4322101 C2 19950614; JP H0831370 A 19960202; US 5543624 A 19960806

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020703

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BERGMANN EVA MARTINA

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BERGMANN THORALD

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-07-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010701

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-07-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000612

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2000-06-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409199 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190751 T 20000415

1997-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970307

1996-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960319

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1995-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE