Global patent index - EP 0632944 B1

EP 0632944 B1 2000-06-07 - PROCESS FOR TRANSMITTING OR STORING DIGITALIZED, MULTI-CHANNEL AUDIO SIGNALS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR TRANSMITTING OR STORING DIGITALIZED, MULTI-CHANNEL AUDIO SIGNALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN ODER SPEICHERN DIGITALISIERTER, MEHRKANALIGER TONSIGNALE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION OU DE MEMORISATION DE SIGNAUX AUDIO NUMERISES A PLUSIEURS CANAUX

Publication

EP 0632944 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93920518 A

Priority

  • DE 4209544 A
  • EP 9300629 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5682461A] PCT No. PCT/EP93/00629 Sec. 371 Date Nov. 21, 1994 Sec. 102(e) Date Nov. 21, 1994 PCT Filed Mar. 17, 1993 PCT Pub. No. WO93/19542 PCT Pub. Date Sep. 30, 1992In order to transmit or to store digitalized, multi-channel audio signals which are digitally represented by a plurality of spectral subband signals, at an encoder, subband signals of different audio channels but having the same frequency position are combined across channels according to a dynamic control signal. This control signal is derived from several audio channels by an audio signal analysis based on a psycho-acoustic binaural model. At a decoder, the subband signals of several audio channels but having the same frequency position are dissociated across channels according to a control value derived from the dynamic control signal, transmitted or stored therewith.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 5/00; H04B 1/66; H04S 3/00; H04S 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/66 (2006.01); H04H 20/88 (2008.01); H04S 3/00 (2006.01); H04S 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/88 (2013.01); H04B 1/665 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5682461 A 19971028; AT 193790 T 20000615; DE 4209544 A1 19930930; DE 4209544 C2 19940127; DE 59310056 D1 20000713; DK 0632944 T3 20000911; EP 0632944 A1 19950111; EP 0632944 B1 20000607; ES 2146617 T3 20000816; WO 9319542 A2 19930930; WO 9319542 A3 19940120

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130318

2013-07-02 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 193790

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130317

2013-04-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130316

2013-04-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20130316

2013-03-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *INSTITUT FUR RUNDFUNKTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20130317

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-03-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-03-27 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20130317

2013-03-25 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

2013-03-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59310056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120402

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120402

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120315

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120405

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090317

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-09-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. DINI ROBERTO

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146617

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59310056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193790

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970805

1997-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970805

1995-01-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940808

1995-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE