Global Patent Index - EP 0633080 B2

EP 0633080 B2 2002-09-04 - Continuous casting mould for casting thin slabs

Title (en)

Continuous casting mould for casting thin slabs

Title (de)

Stranggiesskokille zum Giessen von Dünnbrammen

Title (fr)

Lingotière pour la coulée continue de brames minces

Publication

EP 0633080 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94110511 A

Priority

DE 4322948 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0633080A2] In a continuous casting moulding for casting thin slabs, two cooled broad-side walls (1, 2) form, with two cooled narrow-side walls (3, 4) arranged adjustably between them, an upper moulding section and a lower supporting section. To improve product quality, in particular to avoid edge cracks, the narrow-side walls (3, 4) have differing side strips on the inner, working side of the moulding section and the supporting section, the side strips (3b'' and 4b') in the supporting section (3b and 4b respectively) being offset outwards relative to the side strips (3a' and 4a'') of the moulding section (3a and 4a respectively). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/12 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0408 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0633080 A2 19950111; EP 0633080 A3 19950426; EP 0633080 B1 19960515; EP 0633080 B2 20020904; AT 138000 T 19960615; CA 2127639 A1 19950110; DE 4322948 A1 19950112; JP 3337321 B2 20021021; JP H07144257 A 19950606; US 5503216 A 19960402

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59400276

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-07-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050706

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030706

2003-07-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030706

2003-07-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030706

2002-12-20 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-11-27 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2002-09-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2002-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-05-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1997-04-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 19970214

1996-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960808

1996-08-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

1996-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59400276 19960620

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1996-05-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 138000 T 19960615

1995-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950831

1995-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1995-01-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940801

1995-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT