Global Patent Index - EP 0633310 B1

EP 0633310 B1 2000-03-01 - Preformulation for detergent composition based on polyimide and a silicate

Title (en)

Preformulation for detergent composition based on polyimide and a silicate

Title (de)

Vorformulierung für Waschmittelzusammensetzung auf der Basis von Polyimid und einem Silikat

Title (fr)

Préformulation pour composition détergente à base polyimide et d'un silicate

Publication

EP 0633310 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94401434 A

Priority

FR 9308385 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0633310A1] The subject of the present invention is a "builder" or "cobuilder" preformulation for a detergent composition, containing at least one polyimide polymer mixed with at least one silicate and capable of generating at least one biodegradeable water-soluble polypeptide species when it comes into contact with an aqueous medium of non-alkaline pH. The present invention also relates to the applications of this preformulation in the field of detergency (detergents).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 3/08; C11D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38 (2006.01); C08L 101/16 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3719 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0633310 A1 19950111; EP 0633310 B1 20000301; BR 9402654 A 19950404; CA 2127626 A1 19950109; CA 2127626 C 20020101; CN 1057559 C 20001018; CN 1100136 A 19950315; DE 69423144 D1 20000406; DE 69423144 T2 20001116; DK 0633310 T3 20000605; ES 2142915 T3 20000501; FR 2708279 A1 19950203; FR 2708279 B1 19950901; JP 2914478 B2 19990628; JP H0770592 A 19950314; TW 287197 B 19961001; US 5643863 A 19970701

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040625

2005-06-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050624

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040624

2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-01-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA CHIMIE

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040624

2003-09-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030902

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030619

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-20 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-06-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142915 T3

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423144 20000406

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: D. PERROTTA & C. S.A.S.

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980810

1998-04-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHODIA CHIMIE

1995-01-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940701

1995-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE