Global Patent Index - EP 0633602 B1

EP 0633602 B1 2000-05-24 - High sensitivity, wide dynamic range time-of-flight mass spectrometer provided with a gas phase ion source

Title (en)

High sensitivity, wide dynamic range time-of-flight mass spectrometer provided with a gas phase ion source

Title (de)

Flugzeit-Massenspektrometer mit Gasphasen-Ionenquelle, mit hoher Empfindlichkeit und grossem dynamischem Bereich

Title (fr)

Spectromètre de masse à temps de vol pourvu d'une source d'ions en phase gaseuze présentant une sensibilité élevée ainsi qu'une large gamme dynamique

Publication

EP 0633602 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94110273 A

Priority

DE 4322102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0633602A2] A high particle density in the exhaust volume of a gas-phase ion source and simultaneously a very low particle density in the flight path of the time-of-flight mass spectrometer results in a high sensitivity while simultaneously maintaining a large dynamic range of the intensity display. In order to achieve this, it is necessary to divide the time-of-flight mass spectrometer into two or more regions of different pressure, the different regions being separated by a gas-flow impedance. A maximum particle density in the exhaust volume while simultaneously maintaining a minimum particle density in the flight path can be obtained by integrating the gas-flow impedances (3, 6) directly into the electrodes (1, 2) of the ion source. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 49/40; H01J 49/10; H01J 49/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/62 (2006.01); H01J 27/02 (2006.01); H01J 49/10 (2006.01); H01J 49/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/0422 (2013.01); H01J 49/403 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0633602 A2 19950111; EP 0633602 A3 19951122; EP 0633602 B1 20000524; AT 193398 T 20000615; AU 6615294 A 19950112; AU 6615394 A 19950112; AU 685112 B2 19980115; AU 685113 B2 19980115; CA 2127183 A1 19950103; DE 4322102 A1 19950119; DE 4322102 C2 19950817; JP H07176291 A 19950714; US 5496998 A 19960305

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020703

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BERGMANN EVA MARTINA

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BERGMANN THORALD

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-07-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010701

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-08-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-08-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2000-07-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-07-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409371 20000629

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

2000-05-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193398 T 20000615

1997-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970321

1996-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960319

1995-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1995-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE