Global Patent Index - EP 0634084 B1

EP 0634084 B1 2000-03-01 - HEARING AID COMPENSATING FOR ACOUSTIC FEEDBACK

Title (en)

HEARING AID COMPENSATING FOR ACOUSTIC FEEDBACK

Title (de)

HÖRGERÄT MIT AUSGLEICH DER AKUSTISCHEN RÜCKKOPPLUNG

Title (fr)

PROTHESE AUDITIVE A COMPENSATION DE LA REACTION ACOUSTIQUE

Publication

EP 0634084 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93908828 A

Priority

  • DK 9300106 W
  • DK 43292 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9320668A1] A hearing aid with digital, electronic compensation for acoustic feedback comprises a microphone (5), a preamplifier (7), a digital compensation circuit (3), an output amplifier (9) and a transducer (11). The digital circuit (3) comprises a noise generator (33) for the insertion of noise, and an adjustable, digital filter (27) for the adaptation of the feedback signal. The adaptation takes place using a correlation circuit (31). The circuit further comprises a digital circuit (79) which carries out a statistical evaluation of the filter coefficients in the correlation circuit, and changes the feedback function in accordance with this evaluation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/453 (2013.01); H04R 25/505 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9320668 A1 19931014; AU 3948293 A 19931108; DE 69327951 D1 20000406; DE 69327951 T2 20000817; DK 170600 B1 19951106; DK 43292 A 19931001; DK 43292 D0 19920331; EP 0634084 A1 19950118; EP 0634084 B1 20000301; JP H07505271 A 19950608

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GN RESOUND A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69327951

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-03-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GN RESOUND A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980512

1995-01-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941031

1995-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI