EP 0634229 A1 19950118 - Method, assembly and apparatus for internal cleaning and coating of pipelines.
Title (en)
Method, assembly and apparatus for internal cleaning and coating of pipelines.
Title (de)
Verfahren, Zusammensetzung und Vorrichtung zur Innenreinigung und Beschichtung von Rohrleitungen.
Title (fr)
Procédé, assemblage et dispositif pour le nettoyage et revêtement interne d'une tuyauterie.
Publication
Application
Priority
CH 207993 A 19930712
Abstract (en)
The method for cleaning pipes, in particular installed pipelines (49, 31) envisages that an abrasive medium is passed through a pipe to be cleaned with at least one liquid and one gaseous fluid. The gaseous fluid is in this case present in excess. The acceleration of the mixture can take place by high and/or low pressure. As a result of the use of a liquid, a more protective cleaning can be achieved in contrast to known dry methods. The cleaned pipe is blown dry and subsequently coated with a plastic. The coating takes place by sucking in a synthetic resin plug. <IMAGE>
Abstract (de)
Das Verfahren zur Sanierung von Rohren, insbesondere von installierten Rohrleitungen (49,31), sieht vor, dass ein Abrasivmittel mit wenigstens einem flüssigen und einem gasförmigen Fluid durch ein zu reinigendes Rohr geschickt wird. Das gasförmige Fluid liegt dabei in einem Ueberschuss vor. Die Beschleunigung des Gemisches kann durch Ueber- und/oder Unterdruck erfolgen. Durch den Einsatz einer Flüssigkeit kann im Unterschied zu bekannten Trockenverfahren eine schonendere Reinigung erzielt werden. Das gereinigte Rohr trockengeblasen und anschliessend mit einem Kunststoff beschichtet wird. Die Beschichtung durch Ansaugen eines Kunstharzpfropfens geschieht. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B08B 9/02 (2006.01); B08B 9/032 (2006.01); B08B 9/04 (2006.01); B24C 3/32 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B08B 9/0323 (2013.01); B08B 9/0326 (2013.01); B08B 9/0328 (2013.01); B08B 9/055 (2013.01); B08B 9/057 (2013.01); B24C 3/327 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XAY] GB 1236205 A 19710623 - ABRASIVE DEV
- [YA] EP 0299134 A1 19890118 - NAEF WERNER
- [YA] EP 0053355 A1 19820609 - ALSTHOM ATLANTIQUE [FR]
- [X] US 3914815 A 19751028 - KOBAYASHI SHIGEHARU
- [XA] DE 4119947 A1 19921224 - PFLAMM JOACHIM [DE]
- [A] US 4243699 A 19810106 - GIBSON JACK E
- [A] EP 0326867 A2 19890809 - MULLER KARL
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 54 (M - 282)<1491> 10 March 1984 (1984-03-10)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 92 (M - 208) 16 April 1983 (1983-04-16)
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 68 (C - 686) 8 February 1990 (1990-02-08)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0634229 A1 19950118; EP 0634229 B1 19981007; AT E171886 T1 19981015; DE 59407036 D1 19981112
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 94810410 A 19940712; AT 94810410 T 19940712; DE 59407036 T 19940712