Global Patent Index - EP 0634253 B1

EP 0634253 B1 2000-07-26 - Press, in particular a platen press for woodworking

Title (en)

Press, in particular a platen press for woodworking

Title (de)

Presse, insbesondere Plattenpresse für die Holzbearbeitung

Title (fr)

Presse, en particulier presse à plateux pour le travail du bois

Publication

EP 0634253 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94103642 A

Priority

DE 9307632 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0634253A2] A press (11), usable in particular as a platen press for woodworking, generates the pressing pressure by means of two superposed rows (20, 21) of flexible tubes (19) which are filled with compressed air. An intermediate plate (17) ensures pressure equalisation. The pressing surfaces are formed by heated platens (29), the bottom one of which can be partly pulled out beyond the press frame to facilitate charging and cleaning. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27D 3/00; B30B 1/00; B30B 15/06; B30B 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27D 3/00 (2006.01); B30B 1/00 (2006.01); B30B 7/02 (2006.01); B30B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/064 (2013.01); B27D 3/00 (2013.01); B30B 1/003 (2013.01); B30B 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 9307632 U1 19930902; AT 194940 T 20000815; EP 0634253 A2 19950118; EP 0634253 A3 19950531; EP 0634253 B1 20000726; US 5487332 A 19960130

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010516

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010310

2001-01-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409458 20000831

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2000-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194940 T 20000815

1996-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961011

1996-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951103

1995-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

1995-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI