Global Patent Index - EP 0634353 B1

EP 0634353 B1 2000-01-05 - Door locking system

Title (en)

Door locking system

Title (de)

Tür-Zuhalteeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage pour porte

Publication

EP 0634353 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94110061 A

Priority

US 8964693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2125348A1] A door closing system for subsequent installation on an automatic sliding door of an elevator car is coupled, at floor stops, via cams and couplings with the hoistway door and is opened and closed together therewith, wherein the closing system prohibits opening of the elevator door from the inside of the car when the car is between two floors, i.e., outside the door opening zone of a floor, wherein a rocker mechanism is affixed to a fixed or movable cam of the clutch and coupling mechanism of the door, the rocker mechanism being tilted by coupler brackets of the hoistway door during normal operation of the door within the door opening zone and, via a transfer means, removes a locking pawl from a hook retainer and thus mechanically frees the door for opening, with the rocker mechanism not being actuatable outside of the door opening zone and blocking the car door via the locking pawl that is kept in a mechanically interlocked position via a compression spring. 13

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0634353 A2 19950118; EP 0634353 A3 19950503; EP 0634353 B1 20000105; AT 188449 T 20000115; CA 2125348 A1 19950113; CA 2125348 C 20041012; DE 59409046 D1 20000210; US 5377785 A 19950103

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090629

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090629

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090629

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090917

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409046 20000210

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188449 T 20000115

1997-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970924

1995-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951019

1995-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1995-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI