Global patent index - EP 0634475 B1

EP 0634475 B1 2000-10-18 - Concentrated liquid fabric softening composition

Title (en)

Concentrated liquid fabric softening composition

Title (de)

Flüssiges Wäscheweichspülerkonzentrat

Title (fr)

Composition concentrée liquide pour adoucir le linge

Publication

EP 0634475 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94202049 A

Priority

  • US 9218693 A
  • US 21330894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0634475A2] The pourability and softening performance of amidoamine fabric softeners, such as bis(tallow amidoethyl)-2-hydroxyethyl amine) is improved by blending with a quaternary diester fabric softener, such as N-methyl, N,N,N-triethanolamine ditallow ester quaternary ammonium salt. The amidoamine fabric softener includes at least 5% by weight of unsaturated higher alkyl groups. The compositions are concentrated with amounts of active softener compounds in excess of 25% by weight and, as such, may be used at low levels or maybe further diluted prior to use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/645

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/645 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/46 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/645 (2013.01); C11D 3/0015 (2013.01); C11D 1/46 (2013.01); C11D 1/528 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0634475 A2 19950118; EP 0634475 A3 19961211; EP 0634475 B1 20001018; AT 197066 T 20001115; AU 6730394 A 19950127; AU 673079 B2 19961024; BR 9402813 A 19950704; CA 2128169 A1 19950116; DE 69426140 D1 20001123; DE 69426140 T2 20010607; HK 1014728 A1 20010810; MX 9405352 A 19950131; TR 28733 A 19970220

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-09-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020911

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020702

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2002-03-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010714

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-07-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010714

2001-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-01-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69426140

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-23

2000-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-10-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197066

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971210

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970128

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1996-12-11 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: C11D 1/645

1995-06-07 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C3

- Effective date: 19950118

1995-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE