Global Patent Index - EP 0635088 B1

EP 0635088 B1 2000-10-25 - BUILDING PANEL AND BUILDINGS MADE THEREFROM

Title (en)

BUILDING PANEL AND BUILDINGS MADE THEREFROM

Title (de)

BAUELEMENT UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE GEBAEUDE

Title (fr)

PANNEAUX DE CONSTRUCTION ET BATIMENTS REALISES AVEC CEUX-CI

Publication

EP 0635088 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93908025 A

Priority

  • GB 9300758 W
  • GB 9208015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9321406A1] A rectilinear composite building panel having a pair of opposed faces, and a pair of opposed sides, the panel comprising a pair of spaced-apart rigid face sheets (56), a rigid insulating material (58) sandwiched between, and adhering to, the face sheets, connecting means (60) connecting the face sheets together to resist relative movement between the face sheets in the plane of the panel and out of the plane of the panel; the opposed sides (66, 70) each have a profiled shape for mating with a correspondingly profiled side of an adjacent panel; each side (66, 70) has means (72, 74) for securing, or being secured to, a side of an adjacent panel of the same general construction. The panels can be easily assembled together to form a fire-resistant multi-storey building.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/14 (2006.01); E04B 1/41 (2006.01); E04B 1/61 (2006.01); E04C 2/296 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/296 (2013.01); E04B 1/14 (2013.01); E04B 1/4178 (2013.01); E04B 1/6183 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9321406 A1 19931028; AT 197185 T 20001115; AU 3901593 A 19931118; DE 69329595 D1 20001130; DE 69329595 T2 20010531; DK 0635088 T3 20010226; EP 0635088 A1 19950125; EP 0635088 B1 20001025; ES 2152949 T3 20010216; GB 2280916 A 19950215; GB 2280916 B 19951220; GB 9208015 D0 19920527; GB 9420417 D0 19941130; GR 3035258 T3 20010430; PT 635088 E 20010430; ZA 9302584 B 19941013

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120408

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2013-01-16 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110801

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100409

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAILEY MICHAEL LEONARD

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CONNOLLY GEORGE MICHAEL

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PASSEY DONALD STANLEY

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EVANS ANDREW STEPHEN THOMAS

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BALLA-GODDARD MICHAEL STEVEN ANDREW

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DENNY ANDREW FRANCIS

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HARRISON PHILIP GODFREY

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-11-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAILEY MICHAEL LEONARD

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CONNOLLY GEORGE MICHAEL

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PASSEY DONALD STANLEY

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EVANS ANDREW STEPHEN THOMAS

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BALLA-GODDARD MICHAEL STEVEN ANDREW

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DENNY ANDREW FRANCIS

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HARRISON PHILIP GODFREY

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-04-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-06-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-19 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040419

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040416

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-07 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040407

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-06 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040406

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-02-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152949 T3

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329595 20001130

2000-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI NL PT

2000-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197185 T 20001115

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990201

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941008

1995-03-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI NL PT

1995-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI NL PT