Global Patent Index - EP 0635325 B1

EP 0635325 B1 2001-12-05 - Process for making a workpiece in titanium by sintering and a decorative article made by such a process

Title (en)

Process for making a workpiece in titanium by sintering and a decorative article made by such a process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von einem Titanwerkstück durch Sintern und so hergestellte Dekorartikeln

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication par frittage d'une pièce en titane et article décoratif réalisé selon un tel procédé

Publication

EP 0635325 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94111197 A

Priority

  • CH 224693 A
  • FR 9309530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0635325A1] The invention relates to a process for making a workpiece in titanium by sintering, characterised in that it consists in: - (a) mixing a titanium hydride powder with a temporary binder, - (b) injecting the mixture obtained into a mould in order to obtain a workpiece of the desired shape, - (c) removing the binder, - (d) heating the workpiece in a hydrogen atmosphere up to the desired sintering temperature, - (e) replacing the hydrogen atmosphere by a vacuum or a non-reactive atmosphere once the sintering temperature has been attained, and - (f) cooling the workpiece in the atmosphere of the non-reactive gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 25/00 (2006.01); B21D 53/44 (2006.01); B22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/02 (2006.01); B22F 3/10 (2006.01); B22F 3/22 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); G04B 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/225 (2013.01); B22F 1/0059 (2013.01); B22F 3/001 (2013.01); B22F 3/1025 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2998/00 + B22F 3/225

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0635325 A1 19950125; EP 0635325 B1 20011205; CN 1074959 C 20011121; CN 1101596 A 19950419; DE 69429308 D1 20020117; DE 69429308 T2 20020814; HK 1012600 A1 20020823; JP 3443175 B2 20030902; JP H0776741 A 19950320; US 5441695 A 19950815

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69429308

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090719

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090719

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090719

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090707

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080717

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69429308 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASULAB S.A.

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000301

1995-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950209

1995-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE