Global Patent Index - EP 0635569 B1

EP 0635569 B1 2001-04-25 - Liquid cleaning products

Title (en)

Liquid cleaning products

Title (de)

Flüssige Reinigungsprodukte

Title (fr)

Produits de nettoyage liquides

Publication

EP 0635569 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94201877 A

Priority

  • EP 94201877 A
  • EP 93305720 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0635569A2] A non-aqueous liquid cleaning composition comprising a non-aqueous phase with dispersed particles comprising a carrier material and dye material associated thereto wherein the carrier-dye particles have a certain D(3,2) particle size; a method for preparing the carrier-dye particles; and method for preparing the non-aqueous liquid with carrier-dye particles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37; C11D 3/40; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/40 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/40 (2013.01); C11D 17/0004 (2013.01); C11D 17/0034 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0635569 A2 19950125; EP 0635569 A3 19951011; EP 0635569 B1 20010425; DE 69427137 D1 20010531; DE 69427137 T2 20010816; ES 2157950 T3 20010901

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-21 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060213

2006-06-21 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060213

2006-04-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20020122

2006-04-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20020124

2005-08-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050801

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050708

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050617

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20020122

2002-03-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-03-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20020122

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157950 T3

2001-07-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427137 20010531

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-04-25 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981215

1996-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960403

1995-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1995-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE