Global Patent Index - EP 0635856 B1

EP 0635856 B1 2000-09-13 - Ignition coil

Title (en)

Ignition coil

Title (de)

Zündspule

Title (fr)

Bobine d'allumage

Publication

EP 0635856 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94109288 A

Priority

JP 14793693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0635856A1] Disclosed is an ignition coil which is most small in size without degrading performance under low primary current. The ignition coil includes an iron core (1) forming a closed magnetic circuit through an air gap (2), a primary winding (6) wound around the iron core (1) for magnetizing the iron core (1) and a permanent magnet (4) magnetized in an opposite direction to a magnetizing direction by the primary winding current. A cross-sectional area (SG) of the iron core (1) at which the permanent magnet (4) is inserted is made substantially equal to that (SM) of the permanent magnet (4). In order for the permanent magnet (4) to bias by 2/3 of the magnetic flux saturation point of the iron core (1), the permanent magnet (4) is so shaped that its thickness (LM) satisfies 0.6 mm<LM<1.8 mm and its cross-sectional area (SM) and the cross-sectional area (SF) of winding portion of the iron core (1) satisfies 1.3<SM/SF<3.0. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 38/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 15/00 (2006.01); H01F 38/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0635856 A1 19950125; EP 0635856 B1 20000913; DE 69425853 D1 20001019; DE 69425853 T2 20010315; JP 3391049 B2 20030331; JP H0722256 A 19950124; KR 100242545 B1 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140617

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140615

2014-07-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140615

2014-06-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69425853

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130612

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130612

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69425853

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-19

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1997-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DENSO CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950623

1995-01-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941130

1995-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT