Global patent index - EP 0636266 B1

EP 0636266 B1 2000-08-09 - DEVICE FOR TESTING SMOKE DETECTORS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR TESTING SMOKE DETECTORS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR FUNKTIONSPRÜFUNG VON RAUCHMELDERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE VERIFIER DES DETECTEURS DE FUMEE

Publication

EP 0636266 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94904551 A

Priority

  • CH 9400010 W
  • CH 45593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9418653A1] A device (7) for testing the operation of smoke detectors (3) consists of a housing (1) open on one side which can be everted over the smoke detector (3) and in which there is a test light source (5) which can radiate pulsed light inside a smoke detector (3) to be tested. In a preferred embodiment there is also a test light receiver (4) which receives the light emitted by the smoke detection light source (15) of the smoke detector (3) and controls the test light source (5) dependently upon the light received. The light pulse from the test light source (5) is received by the smoke detection light receiver (14) of the smoke detector (3). It is possible to discover whether the smoke detector is in working order by checking whether it goes into its alarm mode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/53 (2006.01); G08B 17/10 (2006.01); G08B 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/145 (2013.01); G08B 17/113 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9418653 A1 19940818; AT 195388 T 20000815; CH 685410 A5 19950630; CN 1102290 A 19950503; CN 1129882 C 20031203; DE 59409472 D1 20000914; DK 0636266 T3 20001127; EP 0636266 A1 19950201; EP 0636266 B1 20000809; JP H07506447 A 19950713; NO 307676 B1 20000508; NO 943904 A 19941014; NO 943904 D0 19941014; SG 47471 A1 19980417; US 5523744 A 19960604

INPADOC legal status

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140122

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 195388

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-02-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140120

2014-02-06 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-01-29 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-01-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409472

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130104

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130109

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-08-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2011-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-04-13 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20110318

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100204

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2, DE-80333 MUENCHE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20100423

2010-04-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20100423

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2008-11-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2008-11-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2001-01-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-11-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409472

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2000-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195388

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980306

1995-02-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940916

1995-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE