Global patent index - EP 0636322 B1

EP 0636322 B1 2000-12-06 - Feeding device for producing an uniform layer

Title (en)

Feeding device for producing an uniform layer

Title (de)

Fördervorrichtung zum Erzeugen einer Tabakmonolage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport pour la formation d'une couche uniforme

Publication

EP 0636322 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94111024 A

Priority

  • DE 4325838 A
  • DE 4335385 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0636322A2] The invention relates to a feeding device for producing a uniform layer of tobacco, whose substantially separated tobacco components can be subjected to special further treatment, such as the identification and removal of foreign bodies. The object is to form a single-layer, continuous tobacco mat on a conveying means. This is achieved by means of successive guide means (4, 7), operated at increasing speed in the conveying direction (2), of which the downstream, faster-running conveying means (7) consists of two superposed conveyor belts (8, 9) which form a conveying channel (11), and the upstream conveying means (4) is designed as a vibrating conveyor (6) which has a profiled discharge edge (24). With the aid of such an arrangement and embodiment of the conveying means a substantially uniform and gap-free single layer of tobacco can be produced at a high throughput. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/39; A24B 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24B 3/18 (2006.01); A24C 5/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/39 (2013.01); A24B 3/18 (2013.01); A24C 5/397 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0636322 A2 19950201; EP 0636322 A3 19980805; EP 0636322 B1 20001206; CN 1039670 C 19980909; CN 1102556 A 19950517; ES 2153399 T3 20010301; JP 3615791 B2 20050202; JP H07147961 A 19950613; US 5558199 A 19960924

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140716

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140714

2014-11-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20141120

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140716

2014-08-06 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140714

2014-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-07-23 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20140715

2014-07-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409600

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130730

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130717

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-03-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100225 AND 20100303

2010-03-17 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-02-26 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BEST N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-12-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2009-10-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2009-10-30 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCOW

- Free Format Text: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT;KURT-A.-KOERBER-CHAUSSEE 8-32;21033 HAMBURG (DE)

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153399

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409600

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-11

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001206

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990414

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990108

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1995-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE