Global Patent Index - EP 0636666 B1

EP 0636666 B1 2000-05-24 - Pigment preparations with perylene derivatives as dispersing agent

Title (en)

Pigment preparations with perylene derivatives as dispersing agent

Title (de)

Pigmentzubereitungen mit Perylenderivaten als Dispergiermittel

Title (fr)

Préparations pigmentaires contenant des dérivés de pérylène en tant qu'agent dispersant

Publication

EP 0636666 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94111339 A

Priority

DE 4325247 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0636666A2] Pigment preparations comprising (a) at least one organic pigment; (b) at least one perylene derivative of the general formula I <IMAGE> where the variables have the following definitions: A is -O-, -CH2- or -NR<1>-; B<1> and B<2> independently of one another are a chemical bond, -O-, -CH2-, -NR<2>-, -S-, -CO-, -SO2- or -SO2-NH-; L<1> and L<2> are independently of one another a chemical bond, phenylene or C1-C8-alkylene; X is -SO3<(-)>Ka<(+)>; Y is -CO2Ka<(+)>; Z is chlorine or bromine m is from 0 to 4; n is 0 or 1 and (m+n) is from 1 to 4; p is from 0 to 4; as dispersant; (c) if desired, further customary pigment preparation additives.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09B 67/22; C08K 5/00; C09B 67/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09B 67/20 (2006.01); C08K 5/00 (2006.01); C08K 5/42 (2006.01); C09B 67/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/0041 (2013.01); C08K 5/42 (2013.01); C09B 67/0033 (2013.01); C09B 67/0041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0636666 A2 19950201; EP 0636666 A3 19960306; EP 0636666 B1 20000524; DE 4325247 A1 19950202; JP 3650633 B2 20050525; JP H0770461 A 19950314; US 5472494 A 19951205

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140720

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140722

2014-08-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140720

2014-07-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409373

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409373 20000629

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981013

1996-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960206

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

1995-07-05 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19950201

1995-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI