Global Patent Index - EP 0636844 B1

EP 0636844 B1 2001-12-19 - Method and apparatus for maintaining a snow surface

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for maintaining a snow surface

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erhaltung einer Schneedecke

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour entretenir une surface de neige

Publication

EP 0636844 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94115422 A

Priority

EP 91310436 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0541867A1] A method of forming an artificial snow surface and an ice crusher machine used in the method are disclosed. Also disclosed is a method of maintaining a snow surface. The surface forming method has the steps of spraying water onto a floor incorporating a refrigerating unit; freezing the water by the refrigerating unit to form an ice layer on the floor; shaving a surface of the ice layer to generate artificial snow consisting of fine ice particles; and forming an artificial snow layer having an artificial snow surface by leaving the shaved snow on the remain of the ice layer in the course of the shaving step. The ice crushing machine has a self-propeling device for propelling the machine body on the ice layer while shaving the surface of the layer to produce fine ice particles behind the propelling path of the machine. The surface maintaining method has the step of dehumidifying air present adjacent the snow surface to avoid frosting of water content in the air on the surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25C 3/04; F24F 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 3/14 (2006.01); F25C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25C 3/04 (2013.01); F25C 2303/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0636844 A1 19950201; EP 0636844 B1 20011219; EP 0541867 A1 19930519

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051112

2005-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051112

2004-09-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69132883 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 541867

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2001-12-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-03-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAINTAINING A SNOW SURFACE

2001-01-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAINTAINING A SNOW SURFACE

1997-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970520

1995-02-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940930

1995-02-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 541867

1995-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL