Global Patent Index - EP 0637083 B1

EP 0637083 B1 2000-06-07 - Semiconductor device having a reduced wiring area in and out of data path zone

Title (en)

Semiconductor device having a reduced wiring area in and out of data path zone

Title (de)

Halbleiteranordnung mit geringem Flächenbedarf der Verbindungen innerhalb und ausserhalb des Datenleitungsgebietes

Title (fr)

Dispositif semi-conducteur ayant une surface d'interconnexion réduite en dehors et dans de la région d'entrée et de sortie

Publication

EP 0637083 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94111976 A

Priority

JP 20701593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0637083A1] A semiconductor device formed on a semiconductor chip includes a signal processing unit composed of a plurality of signal processing cells arranged side by side in a horizontal direction, and a plurality of input/output cells each connected to a corresponding one of the signal processing cells in a one-to-one relation. The signal processing unit is located near to one corner of the semiconductor chip, and the input/output cells are uniformly distributed and located along two sides defining the above mentioned corner. Each of the signal processing cells is configured to make it possible that a wiring conductor connecting between the signal processing cell and a corresponding one of the input/output cells is taken out either in an upward vertical direction or in a downward vertical direction from the signal processing cell, in accordance with the side of the semiconductor chip along which the corresponding input/output cell is located. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 27/118; H01L 23/528

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/82 (2006.01); H01L 21/822 (2006.01); H01L 23/528 (2006.01); H01L 27/04 (2006.01); H01L 27/118 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/118 (2013.01); H01L 23/528 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0637083 A1 19950201; EP 0637083 B1 20000607; DE 69424830 D1 20000713; DE 69424830 T2 20010118; JP 2718345 B2 19980225; JP H0745709 A 19950214; KR 0135237 B1 19980422; US 5583374 A 19961210

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030801

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-08-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-08-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020807

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424830 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

1997-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970114

1995-02-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941215

1995-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL