Global patent index - EP 0637897 B1

EP 0637897 B1 2000-01-19 - Longitudinal field induction heating device for flat metallic pieces

Title (en)

Longitudinal field induction heating device for flat metallic pieces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum induktiven Längsfelderwärmen von flachem Metallgut

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le chauffage inductif par champ longitudinal de pièces métalliques planes

Publication

EP 0637897 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94111752 A

Priority

DE 4325868 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0637897A2] The inductive heating device uses at least 2 inductors (1,2), each supplied with a MF current, the effective sections (7) of the inductor conductor loops extend parallel to one another, with the current flowing in the same direction. The inductors are arranged in opposing pairs, lying on opposite sides of the treated metal goods (3), the currents in their conductor loop sections flowing in opposite directions. Preferably the conductor loop sections of each inductor are located in a single channel in the surface of the inductor core (4,5), or in separate reception grooves, spaced across the surface of each core.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/02; H05B 6/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/10 (2006.01); H05B 6/02 (2006.01); H05B 6/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/104 (2013.01); H05B 6/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4325868 C1 19950112; DE 4325868 C2 19971113; AT 189097 T 20000215; DE 59409084 D1 20000224; DK 0637897 T3 20000710; EP 0637897 A2 19950208; EP 0637897 A3 19950920; EP 0637897 B1 20000119; ES 2144020 T3 20000601; JP H07153560 A 19950616

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030729

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-04-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030728

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: OTTO *JUNKER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-07-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-07-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-07-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030728

2002-07-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020726

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-07-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-07-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020723

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-07-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020723

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-07-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020722

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-07-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020722

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-07-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-07-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020704

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-07-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144020

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ORGANIZZAZIONE D'AGOSTINI

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59409084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189097

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980729

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960312

1995-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1995-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE