Global Patent Index - EP 0639038 B1

EP 0639038 B1 2001-12-12 - Circuit for converting a stereo signal

Title (en)

Circuit for converting a stereo signal

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zum Umwandeln eines Stereosignals

Title (fr)

Circuit de conversion d'un signal stéréo

Publication

EP 0639038 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94202275 A

Priority

DE 4326811 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0639038A2] A circuit arrangement for converting a stereo signal comprising a centre signal and a side signal into one output signal each for two audio signal channels with a calibration arrangement for minimising crosstalk between the output signals (at 11, 12) is described, which - comprises a (first) limiter circuit (16) which can be supplied with a first one of the output signals (from 11) and which can convert this into an at least almost rectangular (first) amplitude-limited signal of the same frequency, - a (first) mixer circuit (19) for obtaining a (first) DC signal by multiplicatively combining the (first) amplitude-limited signal with a second one of the output signals (at 12), - a (first) control circuit (22) for obtaining a (first) control signal from the (first) DC signal, - a setting circuit (8) for influencing the amplitudes of the centre signal and/or the side signal with the aid of the (first) control signal (from 24), - a (first) storage device for storing the (first) control signal (from 24) and - a (first) switch-over device (25), by means of which the (first) control signal (from 24) can be supplied both to the (first) storage device for storing and to the setting circuit (8) in a first operating mode of the circuit arrangement and the (first) control signal stored in the (first) storage device can be supplied to the setting circuit (8) in a second operating mode of the circuit arrangement. By means of this circuit arrangement according to the invention, a simple, even automatic calibration of the crosstalk is possible. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04S 1/00; H04B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04S 3/02 (2006.01); H04S 1/00 (2006.01); H04S 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 1/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0639038 A2 19950215; EP 0639038 A3 19950927; EP 0639038 B1 20011212; BR 9403199 A 19950411; DE 4326811 A1 19950216; JP H07154900 A 19950616; US 5579395 A 19961126

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59410000 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1996-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960327

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1995-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT