Global Patent Index - EP 0639635 B1

EP 0639635 B1 2001-03-14 - Process for the preparation of a mixture of sodium silicate and further salts

Title (en)

Process for the preparation of a mixture of sodium silicate and further salts

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gemisches aus Natriumsilikaten und weiteren Salzen

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'un mélange de silicate de sodium et d'autres sels

Publication

EP 0639635 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94111110 A

Priority

DE 4327884 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0639635A2] To prepare a mixture of sodium silicates with sheet structure and sodium carbonate peroxohydrate, a sodium silicate which consists essentially of delta -Na2Si2O5 is reacted with continuous circulation at least partially with carbon dioxide and atomised water to form a kanemite/sodium bicarbonate mixture. The kanemite/sodium bicarbonate mixture and further sodium silicate, essentially consisting of delta -Na2Si2O5, is contacted with continuous circulation with atomised water. Finally, 0.015 to 1.5 mole of hydrogen peroxide per mole of sodium silicate essentially consisting of delta -Na2Si2O5 used are added to the resulting kanemite/sodium carbonate mixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12; C01B 33/38; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 15/00 (2006.01); C01B 33/32 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 7/54 (2006.01); C11D 7/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0639635 A2 19950222; EP 0639635 A3 19960501; EP 0639635 B1 20010314; DE 4327884 A1 19950223; JP H07172817 A 19950711; US 5507972 A 19960416

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020716

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-07-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010626

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-06-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-06-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010620

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409679 20010419

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A MIXTURE OF SODIUM SILICATE AND FURTHER SALTS

1999-09-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980716

1997-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT GMBH

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961104

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1995-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB