Global Patent Index - EP 0639706 B1

EP 0639706 B1 2000-12-13 - System for the control of an actuator adjusting the air supply of a vehicle engine

Title (en)

System for the control of an actuator adjusting the air supply of a vehicle engine

Title (de)

System zur Ansteuerung eines Stellglieds zur Einstellung der Luftzufuhr eines Kraftfahrzeugmotors

Title (fr)

Système de commande d'un actuateur pour régler l'alimentation en air d'un moteur de véhicule

Publication

EP 0639706 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94112010 A

Priority

DE 4327455 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0639706A2] A system is described for the control of an actuator for adjusting the air supply of a motor vehicle engine. The said system essentially comprises two sub-assemblies, the first sub-assembly being assigned to the accelerator pedal and the second sub-assembly to the actuator. The two sub-assemblies are connected to one another by way of a single communications line. In addition one sub-assembly is connected to a communications channel or a bus system. Such a system according to the invention is especially simple and cost-effective to manufacture and is particularly flexible with regard to modifications and extensions. In addition emergency running and monitoring functions can be easily implemented. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/26; B60R 16/02; F02D 11/10; F02D 37/02; F02D 41/22; F02D 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/10 (2013.01); F02D 41/266 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0639706 A2 19950222; EP 0639706 A3 19980513; EP 0639706 B1 20001213; DE 4327455 A1 19950223; ES 2154278 T3 20010401

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20061204

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2006-07-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2004-12-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-11-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG/ABTEILUNG: CT IP SV FFM

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-11-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG CT IP SV

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-08-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-08-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-08-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154278

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409606

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-18

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990203

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980918

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1995-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE