Global Patent Index - EP 0639743 B1

EP 0639743 B1 2001-05-30 - Cooking top

Title (en)

Cooking top

Title (de)

Kochfeld

Title (fr)

Table de cuisson

Publication

EP 0639743 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94112654 A

Priority

DE 9312369 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0639743A2] The invention relates to a cooking top having a supporting plate (1) consisting of glass or glass-ceramic material, on the upper side of which at least one sensor (7a, 7b, 7b', 7c, 7d) is placed, a covering layer (5a, 5c, 5d, 6b) respectively covering the at least one sensor (7a, 7b, 7b', 7c, 7d). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/10; H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/105 (2013.01); H05B 3/746 (2013.01); H05B 2213/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 9312369 U1 19941215; EP 0639743 A2 19950222; EP 0639743 A3 19981125; EP 0639743 B1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2007-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409763 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990914

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990525

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

1995-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT