Global Patent Index - EP 0639823 B1

EP 0639823 B1 2000-05-17 - FIRE ALARM RECEIVER AND FIRE ALARM SYSTEM

Title (en)

FIRE ALARM RECEIVER AND FIRE ALARM SYSTEM

Title (de)

FEUERALARMEMPFÄNGER UND FEUERALARMSYSTEM.

Title (fr)

RECEPTEUR D'ALARME INCENDIE ET SYSTEME D'ALARME INCENDIE

Publication

EP 0639823 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94908504 A

Priority

  • JP 9400360 W
  • JP 7303893 A
  • JP 7542493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9420938A1] When data of EEPROM storing set data such as interlocking data representing the interlocking relation between a fire sensor and an appliance to be controlled, correspondence data between the address of each terminal and an installation position of each terminal, display data displayed at a display portion of a fire receiver, reception function data representing the functions of the fire receiver, etc, are updated, the fire receiver of the present invention uses a memory pack which consists of an IC card, etc, and can be removably connected to the fire receiver, connects the memory pack storing data for updating the data to the receiver and reads the data and writes it to the EEPROM. Further, the set data before updating, that are stored in the EEPROM, are read into the memory pack, and this memory pack is carried to a service center, etc, so that set data for updating can be generated in consideration of the set data before updating, and are similarly written into the EEPROM through the memory pack. In this way, even those who have no knowledge on the ROM, that is, electronic circuits, can appropriately update the set data. Moreover, the updating operation is easy. The present invention provides such a fire alarm receiver and a fire alarm system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9420938 A1 19940915; AU 6156794 A 19940926; AU 665904 B2 19960118; CN 1103750 A 19950614; DE 69424484 D1 20000621; DE 69424484 T2 20010118; EP 0639823 A1 19950222; EP 0639823 A4 19960417; EP 0639823 B1 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-23 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20080317

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040307

2003-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030225

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-02-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-04-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DETECTOMAT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-02-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69424484

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981119

1996-04-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19960301

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

1996-04-10 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: G08B 25/14

1995-02-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941029

1995-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL