Global Patent Index - EP 0640155 B2

EP 0640155 B2 2000-01-05 - TEXTILE BAG, TEXTILE WEB FOR BAGS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A TEXTILE WEB

Title (en)

TEXTILE BAG, TEXTILE WEB FOR BAGS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A TEXTILE WEB

Title (de)

SACK AUS TEXTILEM MATERIAL, GEWEBEBAHN FÜR SÄCKE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GEWEBEBAHN

Title (fr)

SAC EN MATERIAU TEXTILE, BANDE DE TISSU POUR SACS ET PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE BANDE DE TISSU

Publication

EP 0640155 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 93909644 A

Priority

  • AT 9300079 W
  • HU 9201585 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9323594A1] A bag made of textile material, the two superimposed hollow textile layers of which are joined together at the sides and bottom of the bag by dobby fabric (6; 8) and at the top by strips (2) of dobby fabric, where the lateral dobby fabric (6) joining the front (10) and rear (11) of the bag extends from the dobby fabric (8) at the bottom at least as far as the top strips (2). Several such bags are arranged beside one another in a textile web, and the dobby fabric (6) joining the front (10) and rear (11) of the bag has a central selvedge (1) for separating the bags. The dobby fabric (8) closing the bag off at the bottom forms one continuous edge of the textile web and the top strips (2) form the other continuous open edge. In the process, a textile web for bags is produced on a power or automated loom with a dobby in a continuous production cycle with shaft threading in of three repeating groups.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9323594 A1 19931125; AT 142289 T 19960915; AU 4049593 A 19931213; CA 2135378 A1 19931125; CA 2135378 C 20011218; CZ 286048 B6 19991215; CZ 9402785 A3 19950412; DE 59303672 D1 19961010; DK 0640155 T3 19970224; EP 0640155 A1 19950301; EP 0640155 B1 19960904; EP 0640155 B2 20000105; ES 2094540 T3 19970116; ES 2094540 T5 20000601; HU 215768 B 19990201; HU 9201585 D0 19920928; HU 9403247 D0 19950228; HU T62347 A 19930428; HU T69479 A 19950928; JP H07506631 A 19950720; PL 172179 B1 19970829; PL 173502 B1 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080512

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-05-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-05-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050512

2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020512

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-05-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020512

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010525

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010514

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010511

- Year of fee payment: 9

2000-06-05 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-06-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-05-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-05-19 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-05-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-05-03 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-04-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CALVANI SALVI E VERONELLI S.R.L.

2000-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-01-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-05-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 19990527

- Year of fee payment: 7

1999-05-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 19990526

- Year of fee payment: 7

1998-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

1998-03-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 12.02.1998 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

1998-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1997-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PLASPACK KUNSTSTOFF GMBH & CO. KG

1997-07-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PLASPACK KUNSTSTOFF GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 19970530

1997-04-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 69734

1997-04-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970416

1997-02-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1997-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2094540 T3

1997-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19961210

1996-12-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Effective date: 19961204

1996-11-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CALVANI SALVI E VERONELLI S.R.L.

1996-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: 69734

1996-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59303672 19961010

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1996-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960904

1996-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 142289 T 19960915

1995-12-27 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: SIVERI, ANDRAS

1995-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950719

1995-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941208

1995-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE