Global Patent Index - EP 0640181 B1

EP 0640181 B1 2000-05-24 - IGNITION SYSTEM FOR SPARK-IGNITION ENGINE

Title (en)

IGNITION SYSTEM FOR SPARK-IGNITION ENGINE

Title (de)

ZÜNDANLAGE FÜR EINEN OTTOMOTOR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ALLUMAGE POUR UN MOTEUR A ALLUMAGE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 0640181 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94901784 A

Priority

  • DE 4235204 A
  • EP 9302868 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4235204A1] An ignition system for a spark-ignition engine (13) has an intermediate layer (10) between a cylinder block (12) and a cylinder head (11) which serves as a cylinder head gasket. The intermediate plate (10) carries at the inner edge of each drilled hole (14,...) at least two electrode pairs (15, 16...) to which an ignition voltage pulse generating device (26) applies a high-voltage energy through feed lines (19, 20...) laid in the intermediate layer. Diodes (27, 28...) in the feed lines (19, 20...) are used for equalizing the high-voltage energy fed to all the electrode pairs (15, 16...) of a cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 15/08; F02F 1/24; F02F 11/00; F02P 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 11/00 (2006.01); F02P 15/02 (2006.01); F02P 15/08 (2006.01); F02B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 11/002 (2013.01); F02P 15/02 (2013.01); F02P 15/08 (2013.01); F02B 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 3800771 A 19740402 - MACKIE R

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4235204 A1 19940421; AT 193354 T 20000615; EP 0640181 A1 19950301; EP 0640181 B1 20000524; ES 2148311 T3 20001016; PT 640181 E 20001130; WO 9409271 A2 19940428; WO 9409271 A3 19940609

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131019

2013-10-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59310048

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-10-11 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59310048

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111018

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111018

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PLAKSIN EUGEN

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070418

2007-04-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070418

2006-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-05-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060502

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060413

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-10 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060410

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041019

2005-10-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051018

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2004-10-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-10-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041018

2003-10-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031006

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148311 T3

2000-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MAROSCIA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310048 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193354 T 20000615

1996-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960403

1995-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950516

1995-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE