Global patent index - EP 0640543 B1

EP 0640543 B1 2000-02-09 - Winding device for a web of fibrous material

Title (en)

Winding device for a web of fibrous material

Title (de)

Aufwickelvorrichtung für eine Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enroulement pour une bande de matière fibreuse

Publication

EP 0640543 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94109260 A

Priority

DE 4328310 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0640543A1] A description is given of a winding device for a web of fibrous material (1), having a carrier drum (2) which is wrapped around at least partially by the web of fibrous material (1), to which drum a carrying axle (3) for the web of fibrous material (1) can be fed and can be laid on the carrier drum surface (4) in a winding position (5) in an axially parallel fashion. The underlying object consists in developing a winding device of this type in such a manner that the risk of web breaks is reduced and the shrinkage and crease-formation of webs of fibrous material (1) are counteracted. This is achieved in that the web of fibrous material (1) is guided to the carrier drum (2), together with a guide belt (8), by a device (7) positioned upstream in the web running direction (6) and is transferred from the guide belt (8) onto the carrier drum (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/16; B65H 20/10; D21G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/16 (2006.01); B65H 20/10 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01); B65H 18/16 (2013.01); B65H 20/10 (2013.01); D21G 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0640543 A1 19950301; EP 0640543 B1 20000209; AT 189664 T 20000215; AT 225307 T 20021015; DE 4328310 A1 19950302; DE 4328310 C2 19970605; EP 0915046 A1 19990512; EP 0915046 B1 20021002; FI 20031049 A 20030709; FI 943854 A0 19940822; FI 943854 A 19950224; US 5551171 A 19960903

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-06-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040616

2003-07-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030623

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409136

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB SE

2000-02-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189664

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970124

1995-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCHINEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940616

1995-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB SE